Phil Newby, executive director of Australia’s Elevating Work Platform Association and chief executive of the Hire and Rental Industry Association, is retiring today after 45 years in the industry
30.06.2015 1
Hertz Equipment Rental has appointed rental veteran Bruce Dressel as chief operating officer
25.06.2015
Roberto Ferramola, founder and past CEO of Airo Tigieffe has joined lift truck manufacturer Mora
24.06.2015
IMT the US based articulated and service crane manufacturer has made three new appointments
17.06.2015
Aerial lift manufacturer Snorkel has appointed Shanghai based Song Wang as sales manager China.
16.06.2015
Offshore/Oil & gas lifting and handling specialist the Sparrows group has appointed Steve Bertone as EVP-Americas
15.06.2015
A team from access and telehandler rental company Riwal has raised €70,000 for charity climbing Alpe d’Huez
Gill Riley Co-found and MD of GGR / Unic Cranes Europe has been awarded an OBE in the Queens Birthday honours
12.06.2015 4
Talbert Trailer has promoted Great Lakes sales manager Troy Geisler to vice president sales and marketing
09.06.2015
Illinois boom truck/loader crane dealer & rental company Runnion Equipment has appointed John Rogalla
08.06.2015
US based crane company Essex Cranes Rental has appointed Marc Dowdell as chief operating officer
John Jennings, chairman of UK based Clements Equipment Hire, is retiring after more than 50 years in the business
04.06.2015 1
Gerrit Slijkhuis founder and managing director of Malmquist Benelux, and a director of Malmquist AB has died
03.06.2015
International rental group Riwal has eliminated regional reporting resulting in the departure of Wayne Lawson
US based Acme Lift has appointed Brian Stanley as vice president of business development for the eastern USA
27.05.2015 1
France Elévateur Germany has appointed Michael Held as a new regional sales manager for northern Germany
26.05.2015
Hertz has replaced the chief executive of its equipment rental business - Brian MacDonald - with Larry Silber
25.05.2015
We have just received the sad news that Ray Kane, a former vice president of manufacturing at Grove Manufacturing has died
24.05.2015
Ritchie Bros. auctioneers has appointed Terry Dolan as president, U.S. & South America, with full P&L responsibility
21.05.2015
UK access rental company Facelift has appointed Ian Nicholson as chief financial officer
20.05.2015
US based Talbert Trailer has appointed Sam Guron as vice president of engineering.
08.05.2015
Hiab and Kalmar owner Cargotec has appointed Leena Lie as senior vice president, communications
05.05.2015
UK based Star Platforms became one of the first rental companies to order the new Haulotte Star 10 mast boom
04.05.2015
David Scott, CEO of TH White - the Palfinger crane distributor for England and a Manitou dealer - has retired
01.05.2015