AFI has appointed Nigel Stevens as group health, safety, environment and quality manager.
06.02.2014
Snorkel has appointed Ralf Hartmann as district manager for Germany, Austria and Switzerland
05.02.2014
UK based rental consultant Joint Venture Sales Consultants, is launching a franchise programme
03.02.2014
Paul Brown of Tadano Faun has retired today after 36 years in the crane industry
31.01.2014 1
Manitowoc Cranes has changed its organisational structure along Global lines, changes include the departure of Philippe Cohet
30.01.2014
Haulotte UK general manager Craig Bentley has resigned just over a year after joining the company
30.01.2014 4
Genie has appointed Patrick Gaul as sales territory manager for Missouri, Kansas, Iowa and Nebraska
Dubai based Al Laith has appointed Michael Donnolly as service manager as Ray Parker retires
29.01.2014
Netherlands based ladder and tower manufacturer Altrex has appointed Jan Keizer as marketing manager
28.01.2014
US boom truck manufacturer Manitex has appointed Bob Bray as its new product support manager
The Access Link, the UK association of independently owned rental companies is adding new members
27.01.2014
UK rental company Speedy has promoted Mark Rogerson from chief operating officer to chief executive
Access industry marketeer David Baxter has joined Florida based Hamar as vice president marketing
Finnish aerial lift manufacturer Dinolift has appointed Petri Paavolainen as managing director.
24.01.2014
Hatz GB has appointed Steve Hewson as sales manager for the Hatz power products division
21.01.2014
Access and telehandler rental group Riwal has appointed Per Rohlwin as country manager Sweden
The Lifting Equipment Engineers Association has appointed Siobhan Hitchen as its first female director
20.01.2014
UK rental company AFI has appointed Matt Scott and Chris Jowett as directors as part of an ongoing expansion
16.01.2014
The Committee for European Construction Equipment (CECE) has appointed Eric Lepine as president.
15.01.2014
US based wholesale rental company Acme Lift has appointed Mike Crouch as president
11.01.2014
US rental company Trico Lift has appointed Jon Raber as manager of its Baltimore branch
09.01.2014
Manitou has appointed Michel Denis as chief executive, replacing Dominique Bamas who has resigned.
08.01.2014
Skyjack parent Linamar has announced the death of David Buehlow, a director of the company since 1998
07.01.2014
Arjun Mirdha has been appointed chief executive JCB North America following John Patterson's retirement