Holger Johan has left German based Power-Lift just three months after he sold it to Dutch based Hoogwerker Centrum.
05.07.2011
Wong Hein Jee, group chief financial officer and company secretary of Singapore based Tat Hong has resigned.
04.07.2011
The infamous financier and shareholders rights lobbyist Carl Icahn has purchased a 9.5% stake in JLG parent- Oshkosh.
01.07.2011
Wynne Systems has promoted Carole Cossu to managing director of its European business.
27.06.2011
New Jersey based aerial lift company Trico Lift has appointed Chris Carmolingo as chief operating officer.
26.06.2011
Louisiana based H&E Equipment has appointed Fred Ransom as regional vice president Atlantic north region.
24.06.2011
UK Based Kimberly has appointed Alex Lowe as Operations manager along with a number of other senior appointments.
24.06.2011 4
Wolffkran has added two new sales representatives to its German sales team.
23.06.2011
Cranes UK, the Tadano Faun and Broderson distributor has appointed Julian Elms as a member of its sales team.
16.06.2011
Power and automation specialist ABB has added three new members to its UK marine and crane services team.
15.06.2011
Snorkel UK has appointed James Darnley as a sales manager, he joins from the GAP group.
14.06.2011
The managing director of Aachen based crane rental company Wertz was shot and killed by her husband last Thursday
US based lift manufacturer Custom Equipment has appointed Chris Dossin as vice president, sales and marketing.
13.06.2011
Serge Bosché vice president of sales & marketing for Manitou Americas is leaving the company.
09.06.2011
Florida based Sims Crane & Equipment has promoted Kurt Kufferman to general manager of operations.
08.06.2011
Snorkel USA has appointed Steve Watts as vice-president distribution to expand its dealer network.
07.06.2011
The UK construction charity, the Lighthouse Club, has appointed Jennifer Deeney as fund raising ambassador.
Tadano Oceania has formally appointed All crane Sales & Services as its Distributor for New Zealand
03.06.2011
Deutz has appointed Christian Krupp as head of finance and investor relations effective immediately.
01.06.2011
Manitou has appointed Eric Lambert as president of its Rough Terrain Handling (telehandler) division.
24.05.2011
Terex Aerial Work Platforms has appointed Matthias Jung as vice president- finance for the European region.
19.05.2011
Maarten Mijnlieff managing director of Gardemann is leaving the business and will be replaced by a new recruit -Mathew Hickin.
18.05.2011
Manitou Finance of the UK has appointed a dedicated sales team to serve both dealers and end customers.
17.05.2011 2
We have received the sad news that after 15 years in access Glyn Williams of Loxam is retiring due to a terminal illness.
16.05.2011