Gelev, owner of Klubb van mounted lifts has recruited ex Comilev engineers Benoît Ribeiro and Jean-Claude Sarraute
07.09.2016
German telehandler manufacturer Wacker Neuson has appointed Wilfried Trepels as its new chief financial officer
05.09.2016
The latest issue of Cranes & Access will shortly go to print so if you are looking to recruit good people contact us now
01.09.2016
Tat Hong has appointed the CEO of its Australia operations, Chen Wei Ng, to its group board of directors
31.08.2016
International heavy lift specialist ALE has appointed Paul Karlsen as commercial manager Scandinavia
30.08.2016
Ingo Schiller has joined Tadano America as executive vice president reporting to president Yo Kakinuma
Kalmar has appointed Peter McLean as head of its Asia-Pacific region, he succeeds Ken Loh, who is leaving
29.08.2016
Dutch international rental company Riwal has appointed Glenn Pearson as country manager for the UK
26.08.2016
UK access and crane rental company Highway Hire has ordered seven new Versalift ETM36-F van mounted lifts
Martti Ala-Härkönen who left Finnish international rental company Cramo last week has joined Caverion
22.08.2016
Flemming Jakobsen of Ommelift sales in Denmark has celebrated 25 years with the manufacturer.
20.08.2016 1
US Aerial lift manufacturer MEC has appointed Pat Witte as vice president business development
19.08.2016
UK rental company Star Platforms has promoted Ian Mitchell to the role of operations director.
18.08.2016
Cramo chief financial officer Martti Ala-Härkönen has left the company while a new chief executive for Cramo Sweden has been named.
17.08.2016
Loader crane manufacturer Hiab has appointed Jan-Erik Lindfors as vice president, new business solutions
16.08.2016
US suspended platform specialist Safeworks, has appointed Vishnu Irigireddy as vice president global engineering
Crane overload manufacturer Rayco Wylie Systems has appointed Joel Francis as US sales manager
12.08.2016
Toscafund has stepped up pressure on Jan Astrand, chairman of UK based rental company Speedy
11.08.2016
Genie has appointed Adam Rimmer as vice president, commercial strategy & operations.
10.08.2016 1
IPAF has appointed Dave Roddy of Genie UK as its UK market manager effective the end of the month.
03.08.2016 4
US rental company Acme Lift has appointed Scott Hoglander as senior vice president Great Lakes operations
29.07.2016
Hiab and Kalmar owner Cargotec has appointed Anna Romberg as vice president of ethics and compliance
26.07.2016
Australian rental company Coates has confirmed the departure of CEO Michael Byrne and appointed a replacement
25.07.2016
Australian based Coates Hire is back in the news this week, with word that CEO Michael Byrne, has resigned
22.07.2016